Dugard v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jaycee Dugard
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv04718
Filed: September 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Carlos T. Bea
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 09/10/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER continuing the bench trial to 12/16/2013 at 9:00 am. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 08/15/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file any Objections to the Motion to File Under Seal by 08/20/2013. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 08/13/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re: Guidelines for Trial in Civil Cases. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 04/08/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ADOPTING tentative decision filed on 01/23/2013. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 01/28/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TENTATIVE ORDER re: Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 01/23/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting proposed dates. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 07/30/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: Supplemental Briefing on United States' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 01/11/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Carlos T. Bea on 01/04/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Designation of Circuit Judge Carlos Bea to perform the duties of a United States District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Alex Kozinski on 10/14/11. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugard v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaycee Dugard
Represented By: Amber Brooke Holley
Represented By: Shawn Chapman Holley
Represented By: Dale Kinsella
Represented By: David Wesley Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?