Edwards et al v. National Milk Producers Federation et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Edwards, Georgia Browne and Torah Montessori School
Defendant: National Milk Producers Federation, Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.,, Land O'Lakes, Inc., Dairylea Cooperative Inc. and Agrimark, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv04766
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTJoint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 27, 2016. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER GRANTING 416 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/11/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL; GRANTING DOCKET NOS. 397 AND 406 AND PROVIDING FINAL OPPORTUNITY FOR DEFENDANTS TO SHOW COMPELLING REASONS RE DOCKET NO 402 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/12/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016) Modified on 2/12/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT REPLY EXPERT TESTIMONY; STRIKING DEFENDANTS DAUBERT AND DECERTIFICATION MOTIONS; AND SETTING REVISED SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland be fore Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 FOURTH ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER CONTINUING DATES. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Selection set for 1/27/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Tr ial set for 2/1/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/10/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING 250 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference and Close of Fact Discovery. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Discovery due by 12/19/2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING 247 MOTION fMotion to Set a Date for the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert and to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 AMENDED ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Plaintiffs additional brief due by 6/13/2014. Defendant's response due by 6/25/2014. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 236 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference and Close of Fact Discovery. Discovery due by 9/8/2014. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/8/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Amended Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Stipulation re Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/19/2013. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TWO DEADLINES IN THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING 177 Stipulation to Continue Class Certification and Discovery Dates. Discovery due by 4/11/2013. Motions due by 10/28/2013. Responses due by 11/25/2013. Replies due by 12/11/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING 159 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF JOE BURWELL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING 154 STIPULATION RE THE USE OF PREDICTIVE CODING TECHNOLOGY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 17, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING : 150 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF ALEX WEINSTEIN. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 144 STIPULATION RE ESI DISCOVERY PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 141 STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM. Motion For Class Certification due to be filed by 9/15/2013. Response s due by 10/11/2013. Replies due by 10/25/2013. Hearing on Motion For Class Certification set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING 132 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 24, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING: 124 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO IMPLEAD THIRD PARTIES, AND SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING 118 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF CORLEA BURNETT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RELATING CASE C-12-4142 DMR TO C-11-4766 JSW. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING 98 STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dairylea Cooperative Inc.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Denying Transfer (MDL No. 2340) (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 80 STIPULATION RE: SHORTENED TIME SCHEDULE FOR DECIDING PLAINITFFS' MOTION TO STAY.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING (61 in 3:11-cv-04766-JSW) Stipulation TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND COMBINE BRIEFS AND AGGREGATE PAGE LIMITATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. National Milk Producers Federation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Edwards
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: George W. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Browne
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: George W. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torah Montessori School
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: George W. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Milk Producers Federation
Represented By: Kenneth P. Ewing
Represented By: John J. Kavanagh, III
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Dylan Ruga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.,
Represented By: Jesse William Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land O'Lakes, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel David Birk
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Vanessa Greenwood Jacobsen
Represented By: Daniel David Birk
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Vanessa Greenwood Jacobsen
Represented By: Matthew Stewart Kahn
Represented By: George Arnold Nicoud, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dairylea Cooperative Inc.
Represented By: Jacob P. Alpren
Represented By: William S Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agrimark, Inc.
Represented By: Paula Lenore Blizzard
Represented By: Ross H Garber
Represented By: Jan Nielsen Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?