Sims et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Plaintiff: Sudie Sims and Michael Sims
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2011cv04768
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/3/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/2/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/10/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: ADR AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS; REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sudie Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Represented By: Nicole M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?