ComUnity Collectors LLC et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ComUnity Collectors LLC, Gwendolynn J. Tyler 2006 Living Trust and W. Darryl Fry
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc., Terwin Advisors L.L.C., Dewey & LeBoeuf L.L.P., Christopher DiAngelo, Roxana Bargoz, The Bank of New York Mellon, Wilmington Trust Company, Specialized Loan Servicing L.L.C., Deutsche Bank AG and Oseberg Asset Management LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv04777
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Defendant Oseberg's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/12/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/23/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 Continuing The Hearing on Motions to Dismiss and resetting CMC filed by Specialized Loan Servicing L.L.C., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing The Hearing on Motions to Dismiss, 62 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Deutsche Bank AG's and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, 66 First MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim , 55 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, 73 MOTION to Dismiss , 59 MOTION to Dismiss , 64 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DiAngelo and Bargoz. Responses due by 4/16/2012. Replies due by 4/3 0/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 44 Declaration in Support, filed by Roxana Bargoz, Christopher DiAngelo, Dewey & LeBoeuf L.L.P.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 18 Stipulation filed by Specialized Loan Servicing L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/3/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ComUnity Collectors LLC et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ComUnity Collectors LLC
Represented By: Edward K. White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolynn J. Tyler 2006 Living Trust
Represented By: Edward K. White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Darryl Fry
Represented By: Edward K. White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terwin Advisors L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey & LeBoeuf L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher DiAngelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxana Bargoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oseberg Asset Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?