Stallworth v. County of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Stallworth
Defendant: County of Santa Clara, Michelle De La Calle and Santa Clara Personnel Board
Case Number: 3:2011cv04841
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/17/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick denying 50 and 54 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS, AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AUGMENT RECORD FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H.Orrick on 08/08/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARIA-ELENA JAMES TO CONDUCT MEDIATION re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/05/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER regarding 47 the parties' May 3, 2013 discovery letter brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/17/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATION / Unopposed Application to Enlarge Page Limit for Opening Brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation to Revise Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 7/15/2013. Replies due by 8/1/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Vacating Case management Conference, Vacating Trial Date, and Setting Dates re Mandamus Claim. Hearing on the mandamus claim set for 7/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/16/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT: This matter is scheduled for a case management conference on Friday, January 18, 2013. In light of the fact that the Court has recently bifurcated certain claims, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint case management statement by January 17, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. addressing the manner in which they expect the bifurcated claims to proceed. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/15/13. (tdmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION BIFURCATING NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS (F.R.C.P. 42(b)) AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER regarding 28 the parties' November 5, 2012 joint discovery dispute letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/21/2012.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 25 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES:Fact Discovery due by 4/8/2013. Expert Discovery due by 5/13/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2013. Jury Selection set for 7/10/2013 08:00 AM in Courtro om 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ADR REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 20, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallworth v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Miguel Alberto Marquez
Represented By: Aryn Paige Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle De La Calle
Represented By: Aryn Paige Harris
Represented By: Miguel Alberto Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Personnel Board
Represented By: Aryn Paige Harris
Represented By: Miguel Alberto Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Stallworth
Represented By: Blaine L. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?