M.G. v. Contra Costa County et al
Plaintiff: M.G.
Defendant: Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department and David Livingston
Case Number: 3:2011cv04853
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 21, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE [re 83 Settlement Conference]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/19/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 74 Letter filed by Anthony Perry, Sean Welch]. One-hour meet-and-confer from 9:00--10:00 AM on 5/29/2013 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 5/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/23/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 67 Stipulation filed by M.G., Anthony Perry, Sean Welch]. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/26/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 61 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, AND SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 40 Motion to Substitute Party. David Livin gston (in his capacity as Sheriff for County of Contra Costa), Contra Costa County (a municipal corporation) and Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department (a municipal corporation) terminated; granting 42 Motion to Continue (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE AND REQUESTING BRIEFING re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT) filed by David Livingston, Contra Costa County, 40 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by M.G., 42 MOTION to Continue CONTRA COSTA COUNTY AND DAVID LIVINGSTON'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND REL ATED DEADLINES; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JANICE AMENTA filed by David Livingston, Contra Costa County, 43 Notice (Other) filed by David Livingston, Contra Costa County, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT), 40 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, 42 MOTION to Contin ue CONTRA COSTA COUNTY AND DAVID LIVINGSTON'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JANICE AMENTA, 43 Notice (Other). Responses due by 2/19/2013. Replies due by 2/21/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 15, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (3/25/2013) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (3/18/2013 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE RE LETTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.G. v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Represented By: Janice Lynn Amenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Janice Lynn Amenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Livingston
Represented By: Janice Lynn Amenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?