Guerneville Business Corporation, Inc. v. Boasberg et al
Plaintiff: Guerneville Business Corporation, Inc.
Defendant: Arthur O. Fonden, Clarendon America Insurance Company, Albert L. Boasberg and Scott J. Mandell
Case Number: 3:2011cv04913
Filed: October 4, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: 1. GBCs motion for leave to file its proposed First Amended Complaint is hereby DENIED; and2. Clarendons counterclaim is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; DISMISSING COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE; VACATING HEARING; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINES. The deadline to complete the Early Neutral Evaluation is extended to August 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 27, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BOASBERG'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING MARCH 30, 2012 HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Boasberg's motion to dismiss is granted. In the event plaintiff wishes to file a First Amended Complaint, plaintiff shall file it no later than April 6, 2012. The Case Management Conference is continued from April 20, 2012 to June 8, 2012, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 1, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RELATED CASE ORDER. Guerneville Business Corp. v. Clarendon America Ins. Co., C 09-0746 MMC, is related to Guerneville Business Corp. v. Boasberg, et al., 11-4913 JSW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 STIPULATION to Dismiss Causes of Action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerneville Business Corporation, Inc. v. Boasberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur O. Fonden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L. Boasberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guerneville Business Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Ray Khem Shahani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?