Stevenson et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Aaron C. Stevenson and Kevin D. Taylor
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Fire Department, San Francisco Fire Commission and Civil Service Commission of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2011cv04950
Filed: October 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER RE: REFERRAL FORF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the unavailability of Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, the referral to said Magistrate Judge is withdrawn and the action is referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT THROUGH SECURITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY HEARING; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 29, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING. The trial date is scheduled for June 6, 2016, at 9:00 a.m., and the Pretrial Conference is scheduled for May 24, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. The parties must complete the depositions of their designated damages experts no later than 30 days before trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Defendants are ordered to show cause why they should not be restrained and enjoined from making any permanent appointments to the rank of H-50 Assistant Chief. A hearing will be held at 9:00 a.m . on April 1, 2016. Defendants' opposition shall be filed no later than February 26, 2016, and plaintiffs may file a reply no later than March 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. With the exception of (1) the disparate impact claims in the Third and Fourth Causes of Action, and (2) the Eighth Cause of Action, the City is entitled t o summary judgment and its motion is granted. With respect to (1) the disparate impact claims in the Third and Fourth Causes of Action, and (2) the Eighth Cause of Action, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs are afforded leave to file, no later than December 18, 2015, a surreply, limited to five pages in length, exclusive of exhibits. As of December 18, 2015, unless the parties are otherwise advised, the Court will take defendants' motion under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. The Court vacates the December 15, 2015 Pretrial Conference and January 11, 2016 Trial date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, LESSER SANCTIONS, FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 HEARING. The Court will hear plaintiffs' motion, but not defendants' motion, on the scheduled date, September 18, 2015. After ruling on plaintiffs' motion, the Court will advise the parties whether oral argument and/or supplemental briefing on defendants' motion is necessary. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE: (1) PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, LESSER SANCTIONS, AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR THEIR INTENTIONAL SPOLIATION OF RELEVANT EVIDENCE; AND (2) CERTAIN EXHIBITS, AND PORTIONS OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS, UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 21, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REINSTATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE The Court having received the parties' Amended Joint Case Management Conference Statement, filed May 11, 2015, the case management conference previously scheduled for May 15, 2015, is reinstated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. The May 15, 2015 status conference is taken off calendar. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 11, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FOURTH AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/5/2015. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 9, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/14/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES. The Court will address the stipulated motion at the November 14, 2014 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/27/14. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CONTINUE ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES, INCLUDING THE TRIAL DATE. The Court extends the trial and pre-trial dates as follows: deadline to file joint status conference statement - January 17, 2014; status conference - January 24, 2014; non-expert discovery cutoff - January 31, 2014; deadline for designation of experts - February 21, 2014; deadline for designation of rebuttal experts - March 7, 201 4; expert discovery cutoff - March 28, 2014; deadline for filing of dispositive motion(s)- April 8, 2014; deadline to meet and confer - May 25, 2014; pretrial conference - July 1, 2014; trial date - July 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES. The Court extends the remaining pretrial deadlines, as follows: Non-expert Discovery - August 30, 2013; Designation of Experts - September 20 , 2013; Designation of Rebuttal Experts - October 4, 2013; Expert Discovery - October 25, 2013; Filing of Dispositive Motion(s)- November 8, 2013; Meet and Confer - December 23, 2013. The Status Conference is continued from May 10, 2013 to August 23, 2013, at 10:30 a.m.; the parties shall file a Joint Status Conference no later than August 16, 2013. To the extent the motion seeks a continuance of the pretrial conference and trial dates and the deadline to amend the pleadings, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 5, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/1/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. Plaintiffs shall file the First Amended Complaint no later than June 1, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 30, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from May 4, 2012 to June 1, 2012. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 25, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 2, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference set for January 20, 2012 is continued to March 2, 2012, at 10:30 a.m. The dates set forth in the Court's October 6, 2011 scheduling order are extended 42 days. The parties shall submit a joint case management conference no later than seven days before March 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron C. Stevenson
Represented By: Murlene J. Randle
Represented By: Murlene L. Randle
Represented By: Robert William Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Taylor
Represented By: Murlene J. Randle
Represented By: Murlene L. Randle
Represented By: Robert William Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Gina Marie Roccanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Fire Department
Represented By: Gina Marie Roccanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Fire Commission
Represented By: Gina Marie Roccanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Service Commission of San Francisco
Represented By: Gina Marie Roccanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?