Ramos v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Sandra Ramos
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2011cv05033
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER TO FILE DISMISSAL BY NOON ON MARCH 29, 2013 [re 45 Notice (Other) filed by City and County of San Francisco]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/27/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SECOND ORDER RE SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT AND JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 12 Case Management Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, 42 Order re settlement status and joint request for continuance of trial date (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT STATUS AND JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE re 41 Stipulation, filed by Sandra Ramos, City and County of San Francisco (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (2/11/2013) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (1/28/2013 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT re 38 Notice (Other) filed by Sandra Ramos, City and County of San Francisco (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT [re 35 Notice (Other) filed by Sandra Ramos, City and County of San Francisco]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/19/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (12/17/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (12/10/2012 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/13/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS RULE 35 MOTION AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying 20 Motion to Produce ]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 23 Discovery Letter Brief regarding withheld medical information filed by City and County of San Francisco]. 3-hour meet-and-confer from 7:30 AM through 10:30 AM 9/7/2012 in Court's jury room. Responses due by noon on 9/6/2012. Discovery Hearing set for 10:30 AM 9/7/2012 before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/4/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 15 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ramos
Represented By: Alan Frederick Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Andrew Martin Gschwind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?