Warner v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Earl Warner
Defendant: Mathew L. Cate, Rabbi Y. Friedman, L. Trexler, A. Solis, K. Kostecky and R. Manuel
Case Number: 3:2011cv05039
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: PSLC KEC
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 61 Report and Recommendations, and DENYING 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/20/17. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/7/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Plaintiff did not appear. Matter is set for a scheduling hearing March 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/28/13d. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/5/2013 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/27/13. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/3/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbi Y. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Trexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Kostecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?