Zulewski et al v. The Hershey Company
Plaintiff: Ryan Zulewski, John Davis, Alex Langan, Nicholas Esposito, Brandon Turner, Sharrell Fisher, Jay Cook, Markessa Carter, Rachel Eckroth, Christina Tyson, Shane Huey and Dominick Ippolito
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv05117
Filed: October 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER APPROVING COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/16/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 257 Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff Graham (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER GRANTING 232 RE-NOTICED MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION, filed by The Hershey Company. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/23/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING re 249 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Tyler McKenzie, Juanita Avilia, Jay Cook, Amy Kramer, Harry Klos, Robert Churney, John Davis, Rachel Eckroth, Yolanda Turner, Sharrell Fisher, Alex Langan, The Hershey Company, Chris Landers, Dominick Ippolito, Andrew Meek, Nicholas Esposito, David Risser, Tracy DeBus, Markessa Carter, Mike Thompson, Teresa Flores, Brett Kitterman, Jenna Ver rastro, Susan Spohn, Ryan Zulewski, Christina Tyson, Constance Cole, Darrin McGowan, Brandon Turner, Brittany Dangerfield, Erin Wadley, Cassandra Hale, Kimberly Lekarcyk. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/15/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 244 Motion for Leave to Appeal. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER REGARDING THE PROPER CALCULATION OF DAMAGES UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT re 226 Brief filed by The Hershey Company, 225 Statement filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/20/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER vacating 232 2/21/13 motion hearing to deny class certification, filed by The Hershey Company. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/14/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 227 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiffs is required to E-FILE the amended document within 14 days.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER re: 219 10/31/12 Joint Discovery Letter BriefJoint Discovery Dispute Letter filed by Tyler McKenzie, Jay Cook, Teresa Flores, Mike Thompson, Jenna Verrastro, Amy Kramer, Brett Kitterman, Harry Klos, Robert Churney, Susan Sp ohn, John Davis, Rachel Eckroth, Yolanda Turner, Ryan Zulewski, Sharrell Fisher, Alex Langan, Christina Tyson, Constance Cole, Chris Landers, Brandon Turner, Brittany Dangerfield, Dominick Ippolito, Andrew Meek, Erin Wadley, Nicholas Esposito, David Risser, Tracy DeBus, Cassandra Hale, Markessa Carter, Kimberly Lekarcyk. Motions terminated.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/3/2012. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/20/2012. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT; PENDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 215 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Plaintiffs and The Hershey Company. Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/10/2012. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SHANE HUEY AND MARK TURNER re 209 Proposed Order,, filed by Tyler McKenzie, Jay Cook, Teresa Flores, Mike Thompson, Jenna Verrastro, Amy Kramer, Brett Kitterman, Harry Klos, Robert Churney, Susan Spohn, Joh n Davis, Rachel Eckroth, Yolanda Turner, Ryan Zulewski, Sharrell Fisher, Alex Langan, Christina Tyson, Shane Huey, Constance Cole, Chris Landers, Brittany Dangerfield, Brandon Turner, Dominick Ippolito, Andrew Meek, Erin Wadley, Nicholas Esposito, David Risser, Tracy DeBus, Cassandra Hale, Markessa Carter, Kimberly Lekarcyk. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 08/06/2012. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RE NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Notice-Federal Law, # 2 Notice-Federal and California Law)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/10/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE RE RELATING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/9/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/31/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zulewski et al v. The Hershey Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Zulewski
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Davis
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Langan
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Esposito
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Turner
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharrell Fisher
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Cook
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markessa Carter
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Eckroth
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Tyson
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Huey
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Ippolito
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: David C. Feola
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Represented By: Rebecca Dianne Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?