Turner v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Stephen B. Turner
Defendant: Melody Smith, Gregory Sims, John Bent, Robert Ambroselli, Matthew Cate, Edmund Brown, Jr. and Tierney
Case Number: 3:2011cv05176
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER DENYING COSTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 05/31/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 03/07/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017) Modified on 3/8/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT FURTHER BRIEFING (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 07/13/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RE REQUEST. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 05/21/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/15/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 102 Motion for Leave to File. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 77 Rule 60(b) Motion. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 72 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 65 Motion for TRO; denying 65 Motion for Order to Show Cause. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/28/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 60 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 62 Motion to Continue. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 48 Motion to Continue ADR Phone Conference and Hearings on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. 20 MOTION to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/22/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Fl oor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/22/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 30 Motion for continuance. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amended ORDER re Ex Parte Application for TRO. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/9/2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Re-setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/21/2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 2 Motion for TRO; granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen B. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ambroselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?