Wierzba v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Wierzba
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Quality Loan Services Corp., Washington Mutual Bank N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Federal National Mortgage Association and Lender Processing Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05199
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 16-2282-KAW. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/10/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED PARTIAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 16 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whit on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION TO E-FILE. (Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wierzba v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wierzba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lender Processing Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?