Pickman v. American Express Company et al
Plaintiff: Heidi Pickman
Defendant: American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., American Express Centurion Bank and American Express Bank, FSB
Case Number: 3:2011cv05326
Filed: November 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO VACATE ORDER; RELIEVING PLAINTIFF OF REQUIREMENT TO PAY AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS by Hon. William Alsup denying 68 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE DATES RELATED TO ATTORNEY'S FEES MOTION by Hon. William Alsup denying 50 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup entered 27 Motion for Attorney Fees.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY BRIEF by Hon. William Alsup granting 36 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 31, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 7 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickman v. American Express Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Pickman
Represented By: Robert Chipley Weems
Represented By: Margaret Mullin Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: JiAe Moon
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Represented By: Jason S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.
Represented By: JiAe Moon
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Represented By: Jason S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Represented By: JiAe Moon
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Represented By: Jason S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank, FSB
Represented By: JiAe Moon
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Represented By: Jason S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?