El-Aheidab v. CitiBank (South Dakota), N.A.
Plaintiff: Adam El-Aheidab
Defendant: CitiBank (South Dakota), N.A.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05359
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - This action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/02/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF REFERENCE re 47 First MOTION for Discovery Motion to Compel Responses to Spec Rogs #2 filed by Citibank, National Association; 48 First MOTION for Discovery Motion to Compel RPD #2 filed by Citibank, National Association. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 Continuing Mediation Completion Date to 1/15/13 and Case Management Conference filed by Citibank, National Association Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 2/7/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Citibank, National Association, Adam El-Aheidab Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 selecting Mediation by Citibank, National Association, Adam El-Aheidab filed by Citibank, National Association, Adam El-Aheidab, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Citibank, National Association Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Citibank, National Association Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/25/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 6/1/12 re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Citibank, National Association Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference, and Order Approving Stipulation filed by Adam El-Aheidab Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 to Substitute Defendants, and Order Approving Stipulation filed by Adam El-Aheidab. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by CitiBank (South Dakota), N.A. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/18/2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Aheidab v. CitiBank (South Dakota), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank (South Dakota), N.A.
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Represented By: William Brian Jones
Represented By: Stuart Bruce Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam El-Aheidab
Represented By: Curtis F. Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?