Federal National Mortgage Association v. Walker
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Cynthia A. Walker
Case Number: 3:2011cv05419
Filed: November 8, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/5/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Aalia Sonawalla
Represented By: Kajal Nasreen Islam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A. Walker
Represented By: Jeff Howard Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?