Putzmeister America, Inc. v. United Equipment Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Putzmeister America, Inc.
Defendant: United Equipment Sales, Inc. and Richard Hibbard
Case Number: 3:2011cv05575
Filed: November 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (thirty days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/20/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Response to First Amended Complaint and Initial Case Management Conference filed by Richard Hibbard, UES Company, Inc.. Response to FAC due 7/31/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/18/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part 27 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Richard Hibbard, UES Company, Inc.. First Amended Complaint on behalf of UES Co. due by 5/18/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/27/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/22/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putzmeister America, Inc. v. United Equipment Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Putzmeister America, Inc.
Represented By: Linda C. Emery
Represented By: Joi Anne White
Represented By: Robert Joseph Yorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Equipment Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hibbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?