United States of America v. Real Property Located at 6 School Street, Fairfax, California
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 6 School Street, Fairfax, California
Claimant: Farshid Ezazi
Case Number: 3:2011cv05596
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 Stipulation filed by United States of America, Motions terminated: 20 MOTION to Reopen Case RULE 60 MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT filed by Farshid Ezazi. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER as modified re 14 Stipulation filed by Farshid Ezazi. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 Stipulation filed by Farshid Ezazi. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/7/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Stipulation filed by Farshid Ezazi. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/17/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 6 School Street, Fairfax, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arvon Jacque Perteet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 6 School Street, Fairfax, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Farshid Ezazi
Represented By: Robert Chipley Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?