Board of Trustees of City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System v. Mendes et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Robert M. Lea, Steven M. Neil, Laurence M. Baer, Edward A. Blechschmidt, John J. Gilbert, Glen C. Warren, Jr., Robert J. Zollars, Michael J. Mendes and Richard G. Wolford
Case Number: 3:2011cv05692
Filed: November 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF DAVE LUCIA'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED by Hon. William Alsup denying 100 Motion for Order to Show Cause.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 29, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion relief from cmo.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 45 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Robert M. Lea, John J. Gilbert. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 15, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part (21) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06417-WHA; granting in part and denying in part (13) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05692-WHA (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ADJOURN CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup denying (23) Motion adjourn case management conferenceadjourn case management conference in case 3:11-cv-06417-WHA; denying (25) Motion adjourn case management conferenceadjourn case management conference in case 3:11-cv-05692-WHA (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2012.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 7, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System v. Mendes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence M. Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Blechschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen C. Warren, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Zollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Mendes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Ian David Berg
Represented By: Takeo A Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?