Tech Data Corporation et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tech Data Product Management, Inc. and Tech Data Corporation
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display Co., Ltd., NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Epson Imaging Devices (USA), Inc., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd. and Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Case Number: 3:2011cv05765
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Filing 294 Conditional REMAND ORDER. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 3/9/15. (Attachments: #1 Order Suggesting Remand to Transferor Courts )(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS re #284 , 9214 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2015 Filing 291 JOINT STATUS REPORT for Track 2 Cases by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Remaining Defendants)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER RE: REMAINING TRACK 2 AND OREGON CASES. Status statement is due by 2/20/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #288 , (9290) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI of Dismissal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 Filing 288 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 9290] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 287 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/2014, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (9267 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 ORDER 9214 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON FLORIDA DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON #246 , 9053 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified on 9/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 Filing 284 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Non-Party Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9214] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS #250 , 9061 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #251 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS FOR WHICH THE PANEL WAS FIRST SOLD TO A THIRD PARTY MANUFACTURER #247 , 9056 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 Filing 280 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #279 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9202] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 7)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 Filing 279 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. re #251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9201] (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 278 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #277 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #277 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 277 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #250 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 276 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #275 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9196] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #275 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 275 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #247 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9195] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 274 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Reply In Support of Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Florida Downstream Pass-On [MDL Doc. NO. 9193] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2014 Filing 273 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case. [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 272 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #271 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9164] filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #271 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 271 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #246 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Joint Opposition to Defendants' Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Florida Downstream Pass-On [Master Docket No. 9163] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 270 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #247 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 269 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #268 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #268 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 268 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #250 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON UNDISCLOSED CONSPIRATORS OR AFFILIATES #215 , 8921 signed by Judge Illston on 7/3/14 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2014 Filing 265 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #263 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING #217 , 8924 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2014 Filing 263 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [Master Docket No. 9141] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 262 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #258 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of #215 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9138] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibits BB and EE to Declaration of Lee F. Berger)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS 8915 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS 8916 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 259 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #257 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. #9135] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #256 , (9093 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #249 , (9059 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 256 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9093] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 255 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #254 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9092] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (DUPLICATE OF MAIN DOCUMENTS - Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhibit EE, #5 Exhibit FF)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Berger, Lee) Redacted-Public Version. (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 254 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #215 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9091] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 253 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. re #212 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporation's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds, MDL No. 9089 (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 252 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. re #214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, (Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds, MDL Dkt. # 9088) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Appendix 3)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, filed as MDL Dkt. No. 9070) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong with supporting Exs. A-I)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 250 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Docket Nos. 9061 and 9062] (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-48 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 249 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 248 Public Version of Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #247 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Filing 247 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #273 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 246 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Motion and Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Florida Downstream Pass-On; And Supporting Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee F. Berger ISO Defendants' Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Downstream Pass-On, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Florida Downstream Pass-On)[MDL No. 9053](Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal #221 , 8923 in 7-1827. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #220 , (8920 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen"), CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #213 , (8917 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 Filing 242 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying #237 , (8984) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Counsel shall take care to include the correct case numbers in it's filings, there were several incorrect numbers in the caption.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #239 , (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Filing 239 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensation at Trial [MDL No. 9010] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 238 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #237 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Master Docket No. 8984 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration, #5 Redacted Exhibit A, #6 Redacted Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Exhibit C)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 237 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of their Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Civil Local 7-11 and 79-5(d) [Master Docket No. 8984] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 236 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #235 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O-1, #16 Exhibit O-2, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z-1, #28 Exhibit Z-2, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV)(Related document(s) #235 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 235 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #215 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [Master Docket No. 8991] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 234 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [Master Docket No. 8985] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 233 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [MDL No. 8976] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 231 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 229 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 228 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 226 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule [Master Docket No. 8947] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 225 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 224 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.s Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (MDL No. 8923) filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 223 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds (MDL No 8920). filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 222 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (MDL No. 8917) filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 221 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Redacted Motion Summary Judgmetn Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #4 Redacted Exhs. 1-18, #5 Redacted Exhs. 27-42, #6 Redacted Exhibits 47-48, #7 Unredacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #8 Unredacted Exhs. 1-18, #9 Unredacted Exhs. 27-35, #10 Unredacted Exh. 36, #11 Unredacted 37-38, #12 Unredacted Exh 39, #13 Unredacted Exhs. 40-42, #14 Unredacted Exhs. 47-48)[MDL No. 8923](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 220 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. 8920] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 219 Declaration of Weifan Wang in Support of #214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Certification of Authenticity [MDL Dkt. 8919] filed byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #214 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 218 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [MDL Dkt. 8918] filed byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63)(Related document(s) #214 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 217 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) . Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brownstein ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 19-26, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 43-46, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 47-48)[MDL No. 8924].(Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 216 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #215 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. 8922] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z, #26 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #215 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 215 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [MDL Dkt. 8921] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [MDL Dkt. 8916] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 213 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., HannStar Display Corporation. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8917), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Request to Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Request to Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Request to Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Request to Seal), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8){MDL No. 8917].(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 212 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8915) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF JEN TE-HSIANG, #2 Exhibit DECLARATION OF PO CHIU)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #210 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Filing 210 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues [MDL No. 8879] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 208 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2014 Filing 206 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES [Master Docket No. 8849] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 204 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 8838 (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 202 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines in Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 200 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation with Proposed Order [Master Docket No. 8804] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 198 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 197 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8789] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE by HannStar Display Corporation Notice of Withdrawal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 188 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 187 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #186 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P. 30(B)(6) [Master Docket No. 8637] filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 186 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P. 30(B)(6) [Master Docket No. 8636] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 185 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #180 , 8498 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re #179 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Filing 182 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 8554] filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #181 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) [Master Docket No. 8553] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 180 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEPOSITIONS IN TRACK 2 [MDL DKT NO. 8498] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 179 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL DKT NO. 8497] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 178 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #176 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2013 Filing 176 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AS TO THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS AND THEIR STATUS AS "BUSINESS RECORDS" [Master Docket No.: 8350] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #171 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER ORDER FURTHEREXTENDING TIME TO MEET ANDCONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONSTO COMPEL 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 171 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL [MASTER DOCKET NO. 8169] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 170 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re 617 , (8115) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Close of Fact Discovery for Limited Purposes (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013) Modified on 6/21/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Filing 167 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd..STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Close of Fact Discovery for Limited Purposes [MDL No. 8115]. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #163 . (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER (8060) stipulation and proposed order re Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2013 Filing 163 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Hansen (Hansen, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra West Neukom (West Neukom, Sandra) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #146 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #144 . (7999) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #145 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #140 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #139 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #141 . (7990) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #142 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 146 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel [Master Docket No. 8001] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 145 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel [Master Docket No. 8000] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 144 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel [Master Docket No. 7999] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 142 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel [Master Docket No. 7983] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 141 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel [Master Docket No. 7990] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 140 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel [Master Docket No. 7989] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 139 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel [Master Docket No. 7988] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re (102 in 3:11-cv-05781-SI), (138 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI), and (7971 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 05/23/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re (137 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI) STIPULATION Regarding Further Depositions, (98 in 3:11-cv-05781-SI) STIPULATION Regarding Further Depositions, and (7933 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION Regarding Further Depositions filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 05/23/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 138 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison) [MDL No. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2013 Filing 137 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Further Depositions [MDL No. 7933]. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2013 Filing 136 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order [Master Docket No. 7919] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7919) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC re #136 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #132 . (7897) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Deadline for Depositions in Tech Data (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #131 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 132 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Depositions . [MDL. NO. 7897]. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 5/13/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 Filing 131 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS [MDL No. 7866] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #129 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2013 Filing 129 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order [MDL No. 7770] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/24/2013) Modified on 4/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2013 Filing 128 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #125 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 126 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 125 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Date Product Management, Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Revised Track 2 Deadlines [MDL No.7652]. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 123 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE: DEFENDANTS' DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE re #105 . (Nos. 11-5765, 11-2225 and 11-3763)[MDL No.7593] (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/6/2013) Modified on 2/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS LG DISPLAYAMERICA, INC. AND LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE THEIR DEFENSES CONCERNING DUPLICATIVE RECOVERY 7090 7528 re #106 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/23/2013) Modified on 1/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Filing 120 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. In Further Support of Tech Data's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [MDL Docket Entry 7492] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 21, 2012 Filing 118 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (MDL Dkt. No. 7409) Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike LG Defendants' Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 117 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. re #105 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Joint Opposition [MDL DOC No. 7369] to Tech Data's 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings in respect of Defendants' Downstream Pass-on Defenses [MDL 7086] (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 12/17/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 12/17/2012. Replies due by 1/11/2013. Tech Data's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Tech Data's Motion to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike LG Defendants's Defenses Re: Duplicative Recovery Hearing re-set for 2/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Hon. Susan Illston granting #115 Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Tech Data's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Pleadings; Defendants shall submit their opposition(s) to the motion by 12/17/2012; Tech Data shall submit their reply on 1/11/2013; the motion will be heard on February 1, 2013 at 9:00 a.m..(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 115 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Tech Data's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 4, 2012 Filing 114 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #106 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, (re [MDL 7090] MOTION to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike LG Defendants' Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery) Opposition to Tech Data's Motion to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Defenses Concerning Duplicate Recovery [MDL 7290] (House, Holly) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 112 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7140) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (MOTIONS CONTINUED FROM 12/14/12 TO 1/18/13) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 110 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. re #106 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, #105 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Tech Data's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Tech Data's Motion to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike LG Defendants' Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery (MDL Dkt. No. 7140) (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 108 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7051) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI.STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TECH DAT CORPORATION AND TECH DATA PRODUCT MANAGEMENT, INC. TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS LG DISPLAY CO. LTD. AND LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 106 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (Master Dkt. No. 7090) Motion to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike LG Defendants' Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 105 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (MDL Dkt. No. 7086) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under F.R.C.P. 12(c) In Respect of Defendants' Downstream Pass-On Affirmative Defenses (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 104 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #105 . *** MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Under F.R.C.P. 12(c) In Respect of Defendants' Downstream Pass-On Affirmative Defenses filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/16/2012. Replies due by 11/26/2012. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/2/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Filing 103 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (MDL Dkt. No. 7051) Stipulation For Extension of Time for Plaintiffs Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. to Respond to Defendants LG Display Co. Ltd. and LG Display America, Inc.'s Counterclaims and [Proposed] Order (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 102 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 101 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 99 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiffs Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 98 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byLG Display America, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaintgranting ( 6793 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (96) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and [Proposed] Order filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Unger, Sean) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 95 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byHannstar Display Corporation. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 94 Toshiba Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #25 and 28) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 93 Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #25 and 28) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 92 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #25 and 28) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 91 Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #25 and 28) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 90 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.'s Answer to Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byChunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 89 ***INCOMPLETE ATTACHMENT - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #96***STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and [Proposed] Order filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Unger, Sean) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2012 Filing 88 Hitachi Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 87 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 86 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 85 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices (USA), Inc.. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 84 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 83 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 82 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Tech Data Corporation; Tech Data Product Management, Inc. bySanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 81 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Tech Data Corporation bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 80 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Tech Data Corporation bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 79 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 78 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 77 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended) (6756 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 12, 2012 Filing 76 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION (N/K/A CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION), CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., AND CMO JAPAN CO., LTD. TO TECH DATA CORPORATION AND TECH DATA PRODUCT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S FIRT AMENDED COMPLAINT byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF HARRISON J. FRAHN IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Susan Illston granting (6460) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI for Extension of Time to Respond to Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint and Tech Data's First Amended Complaint.Associated Cases: 3:07-md-01827-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Tweeter's Second Amended Complaint and Tech Data's First Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION AND NEC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (TECH DATA) 5736 6114 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; #35 #37 in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 71 CLERKS NOTICE: vacating 8/3/12 hearing on Motions #35 and #37. These motions have been taken off calendar and are deemed submitted without argument.THIS IS A DOCKET TEXT ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. re #56 Opposition/Response to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 69 Reply in Support of #36 Request for Judicial Notice filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/20/2012) Modified on 7/23/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2012 Filing 68 REPLY (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Tech Data's First Amended Complaint ) filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Dunavan)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 67 REPLY (re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Tech Data's First Amended Complaint ) Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 66 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 6, 2012 Filing 63 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #61 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Tech Data's Opposition to #35 NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified on 7/6/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2012 Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( 6030 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, ( #55 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI) Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., Tech Data Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 60 Request for Judicial Notice re #51 Reply to Opposition/Response NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re Track Two Plaintiffs' Scheduling Motion filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C-D to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 59 RESPONSE to re #36 Request for Judicial Notice, by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 58 Request for Judicial Notice re #57 Declaration in Support, of Tech Data's Opposition to NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Related document(s) #57 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 57 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #56 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #56 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 56 RESPONSE (re #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) [REDACTED] filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012) Modified on 6/28/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2012 Filing 55 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 54 Request for Judicial Notice re #53 Declaration in Support, of Tech Data's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 53 Declaration of Robert W. Turken in Support of #52 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #52 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 52 RESPONSE (re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert W. Turken)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2012) Modified on 6/28/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). *** DECLARATION FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #53 . ***
June 27, 2012 Filing 51 REPLY (re #42 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed byTech Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 26, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG CO. OF AMERICA signed on 6/21/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5962 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #113 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #126 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #58 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting ( #18 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: #1 Order with Judicial Signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2012 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. filed by Tech Data Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 19, 2012 Filing 46 RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order re: Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( 5732 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., (34 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI) Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/15/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed on 6/11/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5890 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #43 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5812 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #40 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI to continue motion briefing and hearing to 8/3/12 @ 9 a.m. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 31, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5733 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Tech Data's First Amended Complaint, (5736 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, (37 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, (35 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI) MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Tech Data's First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 6/13/2012. Replies due by 6/28/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and to Reschedule Hearing filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 23, 2012 Filing 39 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing from 6/21/12 to FRIDAY, 6/22/12, AT 9:00 A.M. Judge Illston's Law and Motion Calendar is held on Fridays. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.' Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5736 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, (37 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 38 Declaration of Michelle Kim-Szrom in Support of #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Kim-Szrom, Michelle) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Part, Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/31/2012. Replies due by 6/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim-Szrom, Michelle) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 36 Request for Judicial Notice re #35 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Tech Data's First Amended Complaint filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Tech Data's First Amended Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/31/2012. Replies due by 6/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Dunavan in Support of NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Joinder, #2 Exhibit A through D to Declaration of Dylan Dunavan in Support of NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Joinder)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 34 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (5573) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI for Extension of Time for Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by Chungwa Picture Tubes Ltd. 1) The deadline for Chunghwa to respond to Tech Datas First Amended Complaint and AASIs Complaint is extended by fourteen (14) days to May 17, 2012. 2) This stipulation does not constitute a waiver by Chunghwa of any substantive or procedural defense, including but not limited to the defenses of lack of personal or subject matter jurisdiction and improper venue. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed on 5/1/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5549 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #30 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #25 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI for Extension of Time to Respond to Tech Data's First Amended Complaint and AASI's Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 27, 2012 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Tech Data's First Amended Complaint and AASI's Complaint filed by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE to re #19 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 28 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #27 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - First Amended Complaint by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/4/2012) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( #24 in 3:11-cv-05765-SI) Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First Amended Complaint filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, ( 5362 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First Amended Complaint filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., Tech Data Corporation.. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/2/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 4/2/12 granting ( 5340 ) Stipulation to Dismiss Samsung in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #23 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2012 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT [REDACTED] against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices (USA), Inc., Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.. Filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 Filing 24 Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First Amended Complaint filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed on 3/28/12 by Judge Illston granting (5326) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (21) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI The NEC Entities deadline to move to dismiss, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be May 17, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Waiver of Service filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 14, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Michael E. Mumford and Tracy L. Cole (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting (4878) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (17) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI signed by Judge Illston on 2/27/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TECH DATA'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL re #13 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2012) Modified on 2/10/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND re #12 . (11-5765)SIGNED BY SI ON 2/6/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012) Modified on 2/7/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2012 Filing 14 fILED IN ERROR (ATTACHED WRONG DOCUMENT) ORDER granting (4769) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (12) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI signed by SI on 2/6/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012) Modified on 2/6/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Authorizing Plaintiffs Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. to Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. through its U.S. Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(F)(3) filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/17/2012. Replies due by 2/24/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Wagner, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service and [Proposed] Order filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
December 16, 2011 Filing 11 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 10 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pretrial ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Tech Data Corp., etal v. AU Optronics Corp., et al from the Middle District of Florida. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:11-cv-02454. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 25, 2011 Filing 6 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 1827 (JLH)
November 2, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 3 (LS)
October 31, 2011 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart)
October 31, 2011 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to file under seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Singer, Stuart)
October 28, 2011 Filing 3 Summons issued as to All Defendants. (DMS)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (redacted) against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $350 receipt number TPA8056) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tech Data Corporation et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Michelle Kim-Szrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HannStar Display Corporation
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Michelle Kim-Szrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Michelle Kim-Szrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech Data Product Management, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Scott N. Wagner
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Robert William Turken
Represented By: Melissa Willett
Represented By: Mitchell E. Widom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech Data Corporation
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Scott N. Wagner
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Robert William Turken
Represented By: Melissa Willett
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Mitchell E. Widom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?