Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05766
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/01/11. (Attachments: # 1 EDL Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:11-cv-12348. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2011: # 2 Initial tranferred documents) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (PMil)
October 31, 2011 Filing 27 ANSWER to 22 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc.. (Frey, Brendan)
October 25, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE TO APPEAR: CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING set for 7/17/2012 10:00 AM before District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff (MVer)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MVer)
October 20, 2011 Minute Entry - Scheduling Conference held on 10/20/2011 before District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
October 14, 2011 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM Joint Case Summary by Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc. (Frey, Brendan)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED ORDER WITHDRAWING re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support filed by Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
October 7, 2011 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint 16 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Google, Inc. against Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc. by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A-'361 Reexamination Prosecution History, Patentee Amendment, Jan 4, 2010,, # 3 Exhibit B-'361 Reexamination Prosecution History, Notice of Intent to Issue Reexamination Certificate, Feb. 17, 2010, # 4 Exhibit C-'092 Reexamination Prosecution History, Patentee Amendment, Jan. 4, 2010, # 5 Exhibit D-'092 Reexamination Prosecution History, Notice of Intent to Issue Reexamination Certificate, Feb. 19, 2010) (Alamo, Michelle)
September 15, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Google's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1-Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims, # 3 Exhibit 2-Safeco Ins. Co. of America v. OHara Corp., 2008 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 48399 (E.D. Mich. 2008), # 4 Exhibit 3-Nixon v. The Health Alliance, 2010 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 133177 (S.D. Ohio 2010), # 5 Exhibit 4-Dura Operating Corp. v. Magna Intl, 2011 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 24485 (E.D. Mich. 2011), # 6 Exhibit 5-Sharif v. Sharif, 2010 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 86853 (E.D. Mich. 2010), # 7 Exhibit 6-Hollingsworth Logistics Group, LLC v. Equipment Leasing, LLC, 2010 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 115540 (E.D. Mich. 2010), # 8 Exhibit 7-Magna Mirrors v. Dura Global Tech, LLC, 2011 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 30534 (E.D. Mich. 2011), # 9 Exhibit 8-Genetic Techs. LTD v. Interleukin Genetics Inc., 2010 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 87238 (W.D. Wis. 2010), # 10 Exhibit 9-Groupon Inc. v. MobGob LLC, 2011 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 56937 (N.D. Ill. May 25, 2011), # 11 Exhibit 10-Southwest Windpower, Inc. v. Imperial Electric, Inc., 2011 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 15140 (D. Az. February 4, 2011), # 12 Exhibit 11-Dann v. Lincoln Natl Corp., 2011 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 13089 (E.D. Pa. Feb. 10, 2011), # 13 Exhibit 12-United States of America v. Aldo Rinaldo Quadrini, et al., 2007 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 89722 (E.D. Mich. December 6, 2007), # 14 Exhibit 13-Hahn v. Best Recovery Services, LLC, et al., 2010 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 116136 (E.D. Mich. November 1, 2010), # 15 Exhibit 14-Ruffin v. Frito-Lay, Inc., 2010 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 66268 (E.D. Mich. June 10, 2010), # 16 Exhibit 15-Bartashnik v. Bridgeview Bancorp, Inc., 2005 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 33657 (N.D. Ill. Dec. 15, 2005)) (Mantese, Gerard)
September 6, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2011 09:30 AM before District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff IN PORT HURON (MVer)
August 22, 2011 Filing 19 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Alamo, Michelle)
August 22, 2011 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Google, Inc. against Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc. by Google, Inc.. (Alamo, Michelle)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER withdrawing 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
August 4, 2011 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Williamson, Ian)
August 1, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian M. Williamson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Williamson, Ian)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING DEADLINES Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
July 19, 2011 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Google, Inc. (Alamo, Michelle)
July 15, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6) For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Or In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) and Brief In Support of E.D. Michigan L.R. 7.1 Compliance Certification (Alamo, Michelle)
July 14, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6) For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Or In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) and Brief In Support by Google, Inc.. (Alamo, Michelle)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Responses due by 7/14/2011 Signed by District Judge Lawrence P. Zatkoff. (MVer)
June 8, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Alamo on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Alamo, Michelle)
June 6, 2011 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Google, Inc. served on 6/2/2011, answer due 6/23/2011. (Frey, Brendan)
June 2, 2011 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc. (Mandell, Barbara)
May 31, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth I. Kohn on behalf of Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc.. (Kohn, Kenneth)
May 31, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara L. Mandell on behalf of Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc.. (Mandell, Barbara)
May 27, 2011 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brendan H. Frey appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frey, Brendan)
May 27, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Google, Inc.* (LHac)
May 27, 2011 Filing 2 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Mantese, Gerard)
May 27, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-3001508 - Fee: $ 350. County of 1st Plaintiff: Richmond County, NY - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Santa Clara, CA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Patent 5,606,361, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Patent 5,724,092) (Mantese, Gerard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visual Interactive Phone Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan H. Frey
Represented By: Kenneth I. Kohn
Represented By: Barbara L. Mandell
Represented By: Gerard V. Mantese
Represented By: Ian M. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle L. Alamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?