NanoEn Tek, Inc. et al v. Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: NanoEn Tek, Inc. and Digital-Bio Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv06237
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:281
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 11/513. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 23, 2013. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING re 92 Proposed Stipulated Order to Modify Schedule for Markman Briefing filed by Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. Joint Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement due by 9/7/12. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/28/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CORRECTED STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR MARKMAN BRIEFING. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 8/30/13 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/18/12. *Corrected so that the dates only on lines 19 and 20 on page 2 are delineated.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/24/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 79 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NanoEn Tek, Inc. et al v. Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NanoEn Tek, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Higashi Dodge
Represented By: Peter Cuomo
Represented By: David Cotta
Represented By: George William Neuner
Represented By: Marvin Petry
Represented By: Adam Phillip Samansky
Represented By: Robert Emmett Scully, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital-Bio Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: David Cotta
Represented By: Peter Cuomo
Represented By: Deborah Higashi Dodge
Represented By: George William Neuner
Represented By: Marvin Petry
Represented By: Adam Phillip Samansky
Represented By: Robert Emmett Scully, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV
Represented By: Jennifer Hayes
Represented By: Robert Edward Krebs
Represented By: Ronald Frank Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?