Infineon Technologies AG v. Volterra Semiconductor Corporation

Plaintiff: Infineon Technologies AG
Defendant: Volterra Semiconductor Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv06239
Filed: December 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER DISMISSING CASE All claims regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,945,730 are dismissed without prejudice. All claims regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 5,402,017, 6,621,343, and 7,095,281 are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 345 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU PARTIES' STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER IMPOSING RESTRICTIONS TO THE DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 3, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 336 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER CHANGING TIME Infineon shall have until 9/5/2014 to file an opening brief for permission to disclose Protected Material. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/30/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO BRING INTO THE FEDERAL COURTHOUSE CERTAIN EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS FOR PURPOSES OF A CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 15, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRIAN D. JOHNSTON PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER REGARDING VOLTERRA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO SEAL PORTIONS OF INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APRIL 10, 2014 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION OF ORDER 275 by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu filed on July 8, 2013 granting 241 Motion for Leave to Amend and granting in part 244 Motion to Strike. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S 217 MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 233 Stipulation .(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 223 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER VACATING APRIL 19, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER re 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF MOTION, THE DECLARATION OF DAVID LIDSKY, AND EXHIBITS B AND D - I TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. FISHER FILED ISO DEFENDANT VOLTERRA SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO STRIKE INFINEON&# filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, 209 MOTION to Strike REDACTED MOTION TO STRIKE INFINEONS THIRD AMENDED INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND TO CONTINUE STAY OF, OR LIMIT DISCOVERY filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation. The April 11, 2013 hearing date is hereby vacated. The briefing schedule is reset. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/21/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 218 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 212 Motion to Quash without prejudice. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATED REQUEST AND ORDER CHANGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2(A). The Case Management Conference is hereby continued from March 15, 2013 to May 3, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney March 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER re 204 Letter filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/07/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER GRANTING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S 172 MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Defendant's Amended Answer and Counterclaims shall be filed no later than March 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 8, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PUBLIC OPINION re ORDER re 165 MOTION to Strike Infineon's Second Amended Infringement Contentions and to Continue Stay of, or Limit Discovery [REDACTED] filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/28/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013) Modified on 1/28/2013 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE: 178 JOINT STATUS REPORT; ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for April 19, 2013 is advanced to March 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. The portion of the Joint Status Report at page 7, line 19 is sealed. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. The portion of the Joint Status Report at page 7, line 19 is sealed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re 150 Order, Terminate Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/11/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 29, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT VOLTERRA SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION'S RENEWED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR, IN THE ALT ERNATIVE, MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Volterra is directed to file a revised redacted version of said opposition no later than November 16, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 15, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 16, 2012 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 9, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SET DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION AND TO VACATE PRETRIAL DEADLINES; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT. All deadlines are vacated. The parties are directed to file a status report by January 7, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2012.(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION. Plaintiff shall file a response no later than November 9, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re 132 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/3/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 90 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2012. (mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER, Motions terminated: 95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion and Exhibit B Filed in Support of Defendant Volterra Semiconductor Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Insufficient Infringement Conte ntions and to Stay Discovery filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, 96 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED] Motion to Strike Insufficient Infringement Contentions and to Stay Discovery filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, 98 MOTIO N to Strike 96 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED] Motion to Strike Insufficient Infringement Contentions and to Stay Discovery(Infineon Technologies AG's Motion to Strike ECF No. 96 filed by Infineon Technologies AG, 99 MOTION to Shorten Time regarding ECF No. 98, filed by Infineon Technologies AG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/16/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE INSUFFICIENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND TO STAY DISCOVERY, DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER TIME, AND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ALTER / COUNTER-MOTION TO ALTER INVALIDITY CONTENTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER VACATING JULY 6, 2012 HEARING ON DEFENDANT VOLTERRA SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for July 6, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 87 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 30, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER, Motions terminated: 82 MOTION to Shorten Time regarding Infineon Technologies AG's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Infineon Technologies AG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/18/2012. dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER - Denying Administrative Motion to Relate Case filed in case C08-5129 JCS with C11-6239 MMC. The Court has determined that these cases are not related. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infineon Technologies AG v. Volterra Semiconductor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volterra Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: Morgan T. Jackson
Represented By: James Morando
Represented By: Patricia Smink Rogowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infineon Technologies AG
Represented By: Samir A. Bhavsar
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Baxter
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Christopher D. Bright
Represented By: Aaron Douglas Davidson
Represented By: Daniel R. Foster
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: Karen Jacobs Louden
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Patchen
Represented By: Stephen E. Taylor
Represented By: David Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?