Oceana, Inc. v. Bryson et al
Plaintiff: Oceana, Inc.
Defendant: John E. Bryson, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 3:2011cv06257
Filed: December 13, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 40 43 44 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 to Continue December 13, 2012 Summary Judgment Hearing and Case Management Conference to February 14, 2013 Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 10/26/12 re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Oceana, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting New Schedule for Motion to Intervene filed by Oceana, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting New Schedule for Motion to Intervene, 16 MOTION to Intervene . Responses due by 3/6/2012. Replies due by 3/13/2012. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oceana, Inc. v. Bryson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oceana, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea A. Treece
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Bryson
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Rachel Kathleen Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Rachel Kathleen Bowen
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Rachel Kathleen Bowen
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?