Saunders v. San Francisco Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Raymond Samuel Saunders
Defendant: San Francisco Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2011cv06322
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case Settled. Status Conference set for 2/24/15 at 1:00 pm. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/6/15. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Dates other than the follow-up Status Conference set for 2/24/2015 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas are vacated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 12/30/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/30/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 12/18/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 42 MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 48 MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick - The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED regarding the state law claims; the motion is GRANTED regarding Saunders's request for injunctive relief. Defendants motion to strike the untimely declaration of Saunders is GRANTED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/11/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - Attorneys C. Scott Greene and Goli Mahdavi are appointed as counsel for all purposes for Saunders in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1) and the Courts Federal Pro Bono Project guidelines. Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/2/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/3/13. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF SERVICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. San Francisco Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Samuel Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?