Transfresh Corporation v. Ganzerla & Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Transfresh Corporation
Defendant: Ganzerla & Associates, Inc. and Gregory A. Ganzerla
Case Number: 3:2011cv06348
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/19/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 46 Letter filed by Ganzerla & Associates, Inc., for Michael Shen to appear by phone on 1/16/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modifeid, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/13/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING re 38 STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Transfresh Corporation and as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing re-set for 10/5/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Case Management Conference fe-set for 10/5/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/20/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER rescheduling the hearing on the 31 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Transfresh Corporation and Case Management Conference to 8/31/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/02/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 7/27/2012 AT 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/8/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING re 13 Letter filed by Gregory A. Ganzerla, Ganzerla & Associates, Inc., for Michael Shen to appear by phone on 2/10/12 at 9:30 AM for hearing on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transfresh Corporation v. Ganzerla & Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transfresh Corporation
Represented By: E Lynn Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ganzerla & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Hsi-Lin Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Ganzerla
Represented By: Michael Hsi-Lin Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?