Alfaro v. Washington Mutual Bank
Plaintiff: Ignacio Alfaro
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Case Number: 3:2011cv06385
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING re 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ignacio Alfaro. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/7/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Stipulation To Extend Mediation Deadline and Staying Case. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Stipulation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/9/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfaro v. Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Charles Scott Greene
Represented By: Sean David Muntz
Represented By: Joshua David White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Alfaro
Represented By: Wendell Jamon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?