UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Guido
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Jose G. Guido
Case Number: 3:2011cv06481
Filed: December 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Debt-Magistrate
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/10/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Report due by 4/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/6/12. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Debt-Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/5/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Guido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael Cosentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose G. Guido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?