Sutcliffe et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Vicki Sutcliffe and Richard Sutcliffe
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2011cv06595
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Individual claims are dismissed with prejudice and putative class claims dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/4/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING re 69 Letter filed by Richard Sutcliffe, Vicki Sutcliffe for Derek Brandt to appear by phone at the cmc on 2/22/13 at 1:30 PM. Court will initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/21/2013. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Strike (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE BRIEFING DEADLINES AND CONTINUE HEARING as to 49 MOTION to Strike - Wells Fargo's Motion to Strike or, In the Alternative, To Require Plaintiffs to Modify the Putative Class Definition set forth in the First Amended Class Action Complaint. Responses due by 8/27/2012. Replies due by 9/10/2012. Motion Hearing re-set for 10/12/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/20/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK AND PLAINTIFFS VICKI AND RICHARD SUTCLIFFE AND MICHAEL ENNEKING TO ENLARGE DEADLINE FOR WELLS FARGO BANK TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/25/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2012. Motion to Dismiss due by 2/17/2012. Replies due by 3/23/2012. Responses due by 3/9/2012. Case Management Conference re-set for 4/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/15/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK AND PLAINTIFFS VICKI AND RICHARD SUTCLIFF TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Respond due by 2/17/12. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutcliffe et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew Gordon Ball
Represented By: Megan Frances Cesare-Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Sutcliffe
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Bradford D. Barron
Represented By: Zachary T. Barron
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Emily J. Kirk
Represented By: Anna M. Kohut
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Represented By: James Michael Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sutcliffe
Represented By: Zachary T. Barron
Represented By: Bradford D. Barron
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Emily J. Kirk
Represented By: Anna M. Kohut
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Represented By: James Michael Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?