P & K Property, LLC v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: P & K Property, LLC
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv06606
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; VACATING HEARING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM COUNSEL 25 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re: discovery cut off: 1) 10/1/12: NON EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF (Originally set for 8/31/12); 2) 10/29/12: DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS (Originally set for 9/28/12); 3) 11/19/12: REBUTTAL TO EXPERT DESIGNATION (Originally set for 10/19/1 2); 4) 1/2/13: EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF (Originally set for 11/31/12); Further Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/5/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P & K Property, LLC v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P & K Property, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Lenane McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann K. Johnston
Represented By: Ted Aubrey Vincett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?