Tara Hills Drive Limited v. Petker et al
Plaintiff: Tara Hills Drive Limited
Defendant: Darryl Petker, Shauna M. Petker, Myong-Pox Han, Chang-Nan Han, Peter H. Kim, In Soo Oh and Chan Im Oh
Case Number: 3:2011cv06610
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER RE STAY AND STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 7, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Re Joint Status Conference Statement by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laprote. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 122 Motion to Stay until September 30, 2014. Status report due 8/1/2014. Status Conference 6/26/2014, at 10:00 a.m.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/4/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/29/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER SEVERING DEFENDANTS MYONG-POX HAN, CHANGE-NAN HAN, AND PETER KIM re 107 Notice (Other) filed by Tara Hills Drive Limited. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/29/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TO SET FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/18/2013. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/11/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/5/2013. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting re 48 Notice of Appearance & Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorneys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/18/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PHONE APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/29/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND CROSS-CLAIM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tara Hills Drive Limited v. Petker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Hills Drive Limited
Represented By: Peter Wells McGaw
Represented By: Richard Evan Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Petker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna M. Petker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myong-Pox Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang-Nan Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In Soo Oh
Represented By: Sophia B. Belloli
Represented By: John T. Cu
Represented By: Catherine W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chan Im Oh
Represented By: Sophia B. Belloli
Represented By: John T. Cu
Represented By: Catherine W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?