Lambson v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Michael Lambson
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv06669
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IN PRINCIPLE AND TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATE DATES filed by Vernon Michael Lambson. CMC and Mtn for Class Certification vacated. Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 2/1/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/13/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Vernon Michael Lambson. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/25/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting: 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Vernon Michael Lambson. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/28/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS, Case referred to Private ADR re 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Vernon Michael Lambson. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/25/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambson v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Michael Lambson
Represented By: Amber S. Healy
Represented By: Peter Mark Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Meghann Mary Hiscocks
Represented By: Adam P. KohSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Meghann Mary Hiscocks
Represented By: Adam P. KohSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?