Resighini Rancheria et al v. Bonham
Plaintiff: Resighini Rancheria, Frank Dowd and Gary Dowd
Defendant: Charlton H. Bonham
Case Number: 3:2011cv06710
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Gary Dowd, Frank Dowd, Resighini Rancheria, ***Deadlines terminated. 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Gary Dowd, Frank Dowd, Resighini Rancheria.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2013. Case Management Conference reset for 11/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO PURSUE SETTLEMENT filed by Gary Dowd, Frank Dowd, Resighini Rancheria Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RESETTING CMC from 3/7/13 to 5/30/13 at 9:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/2/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Gary Dowd, Frank Dowd, Resighini Rancheria. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 3, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE, CMC RESET FROM 9/14/12 TO 11/2/12 re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Dean Wilson. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 17 Defendant's Motion to Hold Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 4/3/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resighini Rancheria et al v. Bonham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resighini Rancheria
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Dowd
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Dowd
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton H. Bonham
Represented By: Cecilia Louise Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?