Zahabi v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Shirin Abbaszadeh Zahabi
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., and Arash Bahman
Case Number: 3:2012cv00014
Filed: January 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/11/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/16/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE LAY DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2014 11:00 AM to be held telephonically. Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2015 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 1/26/2015 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 1/26/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/16/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (cl, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/19/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/27/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 7/14/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 7/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM THREE AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 62 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Strike (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/18/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 20 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zahabi v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirin Abbaszadeh Zahabi
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Represented By: Shirley Hochhausen
Represented By: Keith Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.,
Represented By: Imran Hayat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arash Bahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?