McGough v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: John P. McGough
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., One West Bank, FSB, U.S. Bank National Association, Miah Callahan, J. Rost Realty, Inc. and Meridian Foreclosure Service
Case Number: 3:2012cv00050
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Sanctions (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting re 82 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens; Granting re 83 Motion to Dismiss; Granting re 85 Motion to Dismiss; Granting re 89 Motion to Dismiss, and Dismissing Case. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing by Defendants Meridian Foreclosure Service and OneWest Bank, FSB re 85 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., 82 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by One West Bank, FSB, U.S. Bank National Association, 83 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by One West Bank, FSB, U.S. Bank National Association, 89 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Meridian Foreclosure Service. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/20/2012. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER CONTINUING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO EXPUNGE, AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson: granting re 93 Motion to Change Time Continuing Hearings on Motions to Dismiss & Motion to Expunge & Continuing Case Management Conference. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant Meridian Foreclosure Service to Answer. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/28/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AMENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 6/20/12. Amended complaint due 7/5/2012.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Thelton Henderson granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss; denying 49 Motion ; granting 51 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/06/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/21/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/15/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGough v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. McGough
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank, FSB
Represented By: Nicholas Bennett Waranoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Nicholas Bennett Waranoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miah Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rost Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Foreclosure Service
Represented By: Michael W. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?