Koller v. West Bay Acquistions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Koller
Defendant: West Bay Acquistions, LLC, Christopher Runci, LLC, Christopher Runci and Todd Harraka
Case Number: 3:2012cv00117
Filed: January 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONDINUING HEARING DATE AND EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER, filed by Christopher Runci, LLC, Christopher Runci, West Bay Acquistions, LLC, Todd Harraka. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 5, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses filed by Christopher Runci, LLC, West Bay Acquistions, LLC. Set/Reset Deadlines as to, 47 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 11/1/2012. Replies due by 11/7/2012. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Scott Koller. Second Amended Complaint due by 11/20/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/14/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koller v. West Bay Acquistions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Koller
Represented By: Kristen Gelinas Simplicio
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Adam Gutride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bay Acquistions, LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Heaton
Represented By: Mark Ewell Ellis
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Runci, LLC
Represented By: Mark Ewell Ellis
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Heaton
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Runci
Represented By: Mark Ewell Ellis
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Heaton
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Harraka
Represented By: Mark Ewell Ellis
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Heaton
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?