Bell et al v. Arvin Meritor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald Bell and Sumiko Bell
Defendant: Arvin Meritor, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc, Bridgestone Firestone, Inc., Carlisle Corporation, CSK Auto, Inc., Dana Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as Successor to Felt-Products Manufacturing Co., Ford Motor Company, Genuine Parts Company, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Honda North America, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Kelsey-Hayes Corporation, Lear-Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, Maremont Corporation, McCord Corporation, National Automotive Parts Association, Nissan North America, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo-Abex Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Company, SPX Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc., AutoZone West, Inc. and Carquest Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00131
Filed: January 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Carlisle Corporation. Carlisle Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/21/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting: 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Action With Prejudice filed by McCord Corporation, 106 MOTION for Settlement MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Donald Bell. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/14/2016. McCord Corporation terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE filed by Kelsey-Hayes Corporation. Kelsey-Hayes Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 98 STIPULATION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice filed by Arvin Meritor, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/30/2015. Arvin Meritor, Inc. terminated(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER, granting 95 STIPULATION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice filed by Genuine Parts Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/9/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 STIPULATION to Dimiss Action with Prejudice filed by Honeywell International, Inc..Honeywell International, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 STIPULATION to Dismiss Action With Prejudice filed by Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/10/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/20/2014 re 86 STIPULATION filed by Donald Bell, Sumiko Bell. Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Company terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Action with Prejudice filed by Ford Motor Company.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/5/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request to be excused from the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/2/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER excusing Federal Mogul's representative in-person appearance at the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/30/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE To the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. IN RE: ASBESTOS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No.VI): MDL No. 875. Signed by Kathryn H. Vratil, Acting Chairman of the Panel on 4/16/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 25 Motion to Remand; granting 42 Ex Parte Application (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Arvin Meritor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bell
Represented By: Stephen Michael Fishback
Represented By: Daniel Lee Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumiko Bell
Represented By: Stephen Michael Fishback
Represented By: Daniel Lee Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvin Meritor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Chew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Firestone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Mary Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSK Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Corporation
Represented By: Randall K. Bernard
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as Successor to Felt-Products Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Paul Lannus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear-Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCord Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex Corporation
Represented By: Robert C. Crane
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Donna Lea Maul
Represented By: Thomas J. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Randall K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone West, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Maurice Harnett, Jr
Represented By: Jeanne Chie Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carquest Corporation
Represented By: Susan A. Ogdie
Represented By: Jennifer Mary Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?