Gross v. Symantec Corporation
Plaintiff: James Gross
Defendant: Symantec Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00154
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/19/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 64 MOTION for Settlement - Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by James Gross Fairness Hearing set for 10/4/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval and Setting Motion Hearing. Motion for preliminary approval due by 3/15/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Vacating Case Management Conference and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss re 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing filed by James Gross. Reset Hearing as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint., Motions terminated: 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing filed by James Gross. Motion Hearing/Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Clerks Notice, Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by James Gross. Reset hearing as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second A mended Complaint. Motion Hearing reset for 12/14/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/14/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/25/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 38 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CMC AND MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING TO AUGUST 3, 2012 filed by Symantec Corporation. Resetting Hearing as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Mot ion Hearing reset for 8/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Case Management Conference reset for 8/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/5/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER continuing motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/24/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. Symantec Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gross
Represented By: Chandler Randolph Givens
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?