In Re Clorox Consumer Litigation
Plaintiff: Megan Sterritt, Susan Doyle, Tina Butler-Furr and Catherine Lenz
Defendant: The Clorox Company
Movant: Kristin Luszcz
Case Number: 3:2012cv00280
Filed: January 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE re 139 MOTION to Intervene. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/27/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/18/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying 99 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 99 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; finding as moot 114 Motion Exclude the Expert Reports of Candace L. Preston and Aimee Drolet Rossi; denying 116 Motion to Strike but granting alternative motion to file surreply. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER requesting additional briefing.Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on July 3, 2014. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule as to 71 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Responses due by 6/27/2013. Replies due by 7/11/2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/10/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting (61) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-00280-SC.Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00280-SC, 3:12-cv-00356-SC, 3:12-cv-00649-SC, 3:12-cv-00764-SC, 3:12-cv-01051-SC(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part (43 in 3:12-cv-00280-SC) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by The Clorox Company. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/24/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Consolidated Complaint to 5/16/12. If Deft moves to Dismiss the Motion to Dismiss Hearing is set for 8/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. The Consolidated Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/19/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Clorox Consumer Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Sterritt
Represented By: Kathleen Lee Barber
Represented By: David Edlridge Bower
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Bailie L Heikkinen
Represented By: Christopher Martins
Represented By: Robert M. Rothman
Represented By: James C Shah
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Doyle
Represented By: James C Shah
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Butler-Furr
Represented By: Vahn Alexander
Represented By: Christopher B. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Lenz
Represented By: Vahn Alexander
Represented By: Christopher B. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clorox Company
Represented By: Kenneth Kiyul Lee
Represented By: Dean N. Panos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kristin Luszcz
Represented By: Anthony David Phillips
Represented By: James C Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?