Cefalu v. Holder
Plaintiff: Vincent A. Cefalu
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00303
Filed: January 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:633
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/3/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE, WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/2/2014. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/29/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 AMENDED DRAFT JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE. As discussed at the pre-trial conference, the parties are to submit any proposed additions to this draft juror questionnaire by noon on Monday, September 29, 2014. Signed by Judge James Donato on 09/24/2014. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part 146 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/18/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Granting 138 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Vincent A. Cefalu. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Vacating Trial Date re 132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference filed by Eric H. Holder, Jr. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/24/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part re 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eric H. Holder, Jr. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/23/13. (tehlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RE: FINAL DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS (Dkt. Nos. 80, 82, 83, 84, & 85). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/12/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS (Dkt. Nos. 71, 72, 73, 74, 75). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/9/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Re Cleanupatf.org writings) filed by Eric H. Holder, Jr. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for telephone deposition filed by Vincent A. Cefalu. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 3, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF NOVEMBER 26, 2012 ORDER re 51 Letter, filed by Eric H. Holder, Jr.; 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Vincent A. Cefalu. Parties are to appear 1/10/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco to Meet and Confer. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 26, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS re 44 First Discovery Letter Brief (Issue No. 2, refiled per Dkt. 42). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 26, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting re 35 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint. Second amended complaint to be filed by 12/10/12. Parties to meet and confer prior to filing. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/02/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cefalu v. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent A. Cefalu
Represented By: Andrew D. Winghart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?