Richardson v. Reyes et al
Plaintiff: Forrest M. Richardson
Defendant: Graham, D. Ogle, Young, T. Moreno, Reyes and C. Morales
Case Number: 3:2012cv00310
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 33 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by D. Ogle, T. Moreno, Denise Reyes, Graham, Young. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING re 17 MOTION Defendants' Request for Screening Order Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A; Waiver of Reply Under 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g); Demand for Jury Trial filed by D. Ogle, T. Moreno, Graham, Young. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 3, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Reyes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Ogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest M. Richardson
Represented By: James Vincent Weixel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?