Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. v. Valentino et al
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Defendant: Abraham Valentino, John Chu, Corporate Counsel Law Group LLP, Neszhao Consulting Company, LLC and Kevin Nesbitt
Case Number: 3:2012cv00334
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING MOTION BY DEFENDANTS CHU AND CORPORATE COUNSEL LAW GROUP FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 75 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION BY DEFENDANTS CHU AND CORPORATE COUNSEL LAW GROUP TO FILE UNDER SEAL 73 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING MOTION BY DEFENDANTS CHU AND CORPORATE COUNSEL LAW GROUP TO FILE UNDER SEAL 71 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Judge Illston on 1/9/13 granting substitution of counsel. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING CHU, CORPORATE COUNSEL LAW GROUP and VALENTINO'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING NESBITT AND NESZAHO'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 41 42 43 45 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER continuing 6/18/12 cmc to 7/20/12, Motions terminated: 51 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 35 5 18 19 23 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting substitution of counsel. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/28/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. v. Valentino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Bruce Wolfe
Represented By: Marcus T Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Valentino
Represented By: Michael George Wah Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chu
Represented By: John Paul Girarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Counsel Law Group LLP
Represented By: John Paul Girarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neszhao Consulting Company, LLC
Represented By: Richard S.E. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Nesbitt
Represented By: Richard S.E. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?