Tsang et al v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Tsang, Adrian Vilchez, Markiss Ybarra and Keith Craft
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00427
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (30 days conditional dismissal), Keith Craft terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/5/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Denying Request for Telephonic Appearance signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 5/4/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 99 STIPULATION WI filed by Markiss Ybarra. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/16/2015. Markiss Ybarra terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 STIPULATION re Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Charles Coleman. Terminating/Vacating, 75 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Plaintiff Charles Coleman's Fourth, Sixth, Eighth, Thirteenth and Fourteenth Claims for Relief filed by Office Depot, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 74 STIPULATION Re Waiving Jury at Trial filed by Charles Coleman. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/5/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer striking 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 71 Ex Parte Application (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ATTENDANCE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/25/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/15/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Charles Coleman, ORDER RELATING CASE(S) C-12-0427 CRB and C-12-5244 KAW. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/26/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsang et al v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Tsang
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Represented By: Trung Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Vilchez
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Represented By: Trung Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markiss Ybarra
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Represented By: Trung Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Craft
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Represented By: Trung Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan C Arnett
Represented By: Jennifer Lea Bradford
Represented By: Barbara Jean Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?