Hogya v. City of Petaluma et al
Plaintiff: Edward D. Hogya
Defendant: Jason D. Jucutan and City of Petaluma
Case Number: 3:2012cv00554
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 44 FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 36 MODIFYING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL DATE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 9/23/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 9/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/2/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONERENCE: Settlement Conference reset to 10/30/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/13/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 28 Letter Brief filed by City of Petaluma, Jason D. Jucutan. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on September 7, 2012. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/6/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogya v. City of Petaluma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D. Jucutan
Represented By: Tricia L. Hynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Petaluma
Represented By: Tricia L. Hynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward D. Hogya
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: W. Gordon Kaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?