Fraser v. ASUS Computer International et al
Plaintiff: Colin Fraser
Defendant: ASUS Computer International and Asustek Computer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00652
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT dated 7/12/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/12/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/24/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE SECOND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 69 Motion for Settlement.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING REVISED SETTLEMENT AND JOINT MOTION FOR HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 65 Motion for Hearing.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 46 Motion for Settlement.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING FORM OF NOTICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE DOWNLOADS ON TABLET DEVICES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Hon. William Alsup denying 19 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 13, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraser v. ASUS Computer International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Fraser
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Kathleen Lee Barber
Represented By: Mark S. Fistos
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Bailie L Heikkinen
Represented By: Dennis J. Herman
Represented By: Steven R. Jaffe
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUS Computer International
Represented By: Justin M. Lichterman
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M. Lichterman
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?