Masterobjects, Inc. v. eBay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Masterobjects, Inc.
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00680
Filed: February 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 113 Stipulation to Extend Certain Pretrial Dates (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SECOND ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (Dkt. No. 90). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/31/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS (Dkt. Nos. 90-3, 93). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/24/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (Dkt. No. 90). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/23/2013 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF REGARDING PRODUCTION OF PRINTED SOURCE CODE (Dkt. No. 89). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/15/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF REGARDING PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE (Dkt. No. 80). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 73 Discovery Letter Brief. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Dkt. Nos. 36 & 57). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/12/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/6/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying without prejudice 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified on 4/3/2013 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/28/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULE. Tutorial Hearing set for 2/5/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/6/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/15/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masterobjects, Inc. v. eBay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masterobjects, Inc.
Represented By: George F. Bishop
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: William Patrick Nelson
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?