Verinata Health, Inc. et al v. Sequenom, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Verinata Health, Inc. and The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Defendant: Sequenom, Inc. and Sequenom Center for Molecular Medicine, LLC
Miscellaneous: Isis Innovation Limited
Case Number: 3:2012cv00865
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER RE: STATUS OF BIOGEN CASE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL 355 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 347 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL 255 274 293 296 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER DENYING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND STAYING CASE 344 252 305 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER RE: CLARIFICATION OF NUMBER OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS TO BE FILED (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE TWO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS 244 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER GRANTING CUHK'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' MOTIONS TO SEAL 221 231 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER, Motions terminated: 226 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Schedule filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2015 03 :30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/25/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER, Motions terminated: 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/14 is continued to 8/1/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/9/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER, Motions terminated: 213 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Chinese University Hong Kong. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/7/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING CUHK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING SEQUENOM'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 206 207 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REGARDING SERVICE 201 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER: (1) RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES; AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL 190 191 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE 189 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE COMPLAINT 174 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE 176 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 172 Stipulation and ORDER REGARDING CUSTODIAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE 169 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THEIR INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS 164 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DENYNG MOTION TO SEAL re 101 . If Sequenom wishes to refile a motion to seal Exhibit 10, it may do so by no later than August 5, 2013. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/29/2013) Modified on 7/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING VERINATA'S MOTION TO COMPEL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verinata Health, Inc. et al v. Sequenom, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verinata Health, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Derek C. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Derek C. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequenom, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequenom Center for Molecular Medicine, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Isis Innovation Limited
Represented By: Mario Aieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?