Russell v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Erik Russell
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department, Greg Suhr and Damien Reyes
Case Number: 3:2012cv00929
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/1/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING re 38 joint Letter Re: Motion to Compel filed by Erik Russell.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/5/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2012. Case Management Conference re-set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/10/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING re 17 Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order Re Same filed by Damien Reyes, City and County of San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012. Case Management Conference re-set for 7/20/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/5/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Russell
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?