Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. Global Alliance Logistics (L.A.), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Defendant: Global Alliance Logistics (L.A.), Inc., Global Alliance Logistics (MIA), Inc. and Global Alliance Logistics (NYC), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00936
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/21/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED JOINT CMC STATEMENT BY 1/17/14. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/30/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 Case Management Statement filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/2/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Status Report due by 3/28/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/14/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 14 Proposed Order, filed by Global Alliance Logistics (MIA), Inc., Global Alliance Logistics (NYC), Inc., Global Alliance Logistics (L.A.), Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/6/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 8 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 4 Stipulation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. Global Alliance Logistics (L.A.), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Conte C. Cicala
Represented By: Erich Paul Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Alliance Logistics (L.A.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Alliance Logistics (MIA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Alliance Logistics (NYC), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?