ConocoPhillips Company v. Macchia
Plaintiff: ConocoPhillips Company
Defendant: Michael J. Macchia
Case Number: 3:2012cv01134
Filed: March 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT ON BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS. Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Requiring Status Report on Bankruptcy Proceedings. Status Report due by 9/4/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/12/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING [54Stipulated Request For Order Continuing Mediation Completion Deadline, Civ. LR. 6-2, 7-12. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 51 STIPULATION re 49 MOTION for Writ of Attachment. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/12/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulated Temporary Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 STIPULATION SELECTING Private ADR. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/2/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 24, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ConocoPhillips Company v. Macchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Peter Abraham Cownan
Represented By: Adam Friedenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Macchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?